US HB564 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-17 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 651.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-17 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 651.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Endangered Salmon and Fisheries Predation Prevention Act This bill amends the Marine Mammal Protection Act of 1972 to authorize the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (NOAA) to issue one-year permits to Washington, Oregon, Idaho, the Nez Perce Tribe, the Confederated Tribes of the Umatilla Indian Reservation, the Confederated Tribes of the Warm Springs Reservation of Oregon, the Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation, and the Columbia River Inter-Tribal Fish Commission for the lethal taking on the waters of the Columbia River or its tributaries of sea lions that are part of a healthy population that is not listed as an endangered species or threatened species under the Endangered Species Act of 1973 in order to protect endangered and threatened species of salmon and other nonlisted fish species. These permits may be renewed by NOAA. The permits may authorize the lethal taking of 10 sea lions or fewer. The cumulative annual taking of sea lions each year under all such permits is limited to 1% of the annual potential biological removal level. These permits are exempted from environmental review requirements of the National Environmental Policy Act of 1969 for five years. NOAA may suspend the issuance of such permits if, after five years, lethal removal authority is no longer necessary to protect salmonid and other fish species from sea lion predation.
Title
Endangered Salmon and Fisheries Predation Prevention Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] | Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] |
Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-17 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 651. |
2016-11-17 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-830. |
2016-09-22 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 17 - 13. |
2016-09-22 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-09-22 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Discharged. |
2015-07-23 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2015-03-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2015-01-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2015-01-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Animals
Endangered and threatened species
Fishes
Lakes and rivers
Licensing and registrations
Mammals
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Oregon
Pacific Ocean
Washington State
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Endangered and threatened species
Fishes
Lakes and rivers
Licensing and registrations
Mammals
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Oregon
Pacific Ocean
Washington State
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection