US HB564 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-01-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-01-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Superfund Reinvestment Act of 2009 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code by reinstating until January 1, 2018, the Hazardous Substance Superfund financing rate and the corporate environmental income tax.
Title
Superfund Reinvestment Act of 2009
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Ackerman [D-NY] | Rep. Howard Berman [D-CA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Lois Capps [D-CA] |
Rep. Russ Carnahan [D-MO] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] |
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] | Rep. Norman Dicks [D-WA] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] |
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Maurice Hinchey [D-NY] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Rep. Rush Holt [D-NJ] |
Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] | Rep. Jay Inslee [D-WA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Sander Levin [D-MI] |
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA] | Rep. James Moran [D-VA] |
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] |
Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] | Rep. Fortney Stark [D-CA] | Rep. Bart Stupak [D-MI] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] |
Rep. Henry Waxman [D-CA] | Rep. Anthony Weiner [D-NY] | Rep. David Wu [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-01-15 | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2009-01-15 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E101) |
Same As/Similar To
HB832 (Related) 2009-02-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB3125 (Related) 2010-03-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3164 (Related) 2010-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3125 (Related) 2010-03-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3164 (Related) 2010-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Government trust funds
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Pollution liability
Sales and excise taxes
Taxation
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Pollution liability
Sales and excise taxes
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/564/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr564/BILLS-111hr564ih.pdf |