US HB5515 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-11-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-11-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Elder Justice Reauthorization Act - Reauthorizes the Elder Justice Act of 2009 and funding for its programs through FY2019. Amends the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act to reauthorize through FY2019: (1) the National Training Institute for Federal and State Surveyors, and (2) grants by the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to state agencies that perform surveys of skilled nursing facilities or nursing facilities.
Title
Elder Justice Reauthorization Act
Sponsors
Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Timothy Bishop [D-NY] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Alan Grayson [D-FL] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] |
Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Michelle Lujan Grisham [D-NM] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training. |
2014-10-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2014-09-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2014-09-17 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2014-09-17 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2014-09-17 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-09-17 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2014-09-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Energy and Commerce, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Aging
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Health facilities and institutions
Law enforcement administration and funding
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Social security and elderly assistance
Social welfare
Aging
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Health facilities and institutions
Law enforcement administration and funding
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Social security and elderly assistance
Social welfare
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/5515/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr5515/BILLS-113hr5515ih.pdf |