US HB5448 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-11-20 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-11-20 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
John F. Kennedy Center Reauthorization Act of 2014 - Amends the John F. Kennedy Center Act to authorize appropriations to the Board of Trustees of the John F. Kennedy Center for the Performing Arts for FY2015-FY2019 for maintenance, repair, and security, and for capital projects.
Title
John F. Kennedy Center Reauthorization Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2014-11-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-11-19 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8080) |
2014-11-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5448. |
2014-11-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8080-8081) |
2014-11-19 | House | Mr. Mica moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2014-11-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 455. |
2014-11-12 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 113-613. |
2014-09-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2014-09-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-09-17 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2014-09-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2014-09-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
Subjects
Arts, culture, religion
District of Columbia
Humanities programs funding
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Performing arts
District of Columbia
Humanities programs funding
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Performing arts