US HB5426 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration Commissioned Officer Corps Amendments Act of 2013
Title
National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration Commissioned Officer Corps Amendments Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Grayson [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2014-09-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs. |
2014-09-09 | House | Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform |
2014-09-09 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-09-09 | House | Referred to House Veterans' Affairs |
2014-09-09 | House | Referred to House Armed Services |
2014-09-09 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2014-09-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Veterans' Affairs, the Judiciary, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1068 (Related) 2014-02-14 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
Appropriations
Atmospheric science and weather
Congressional oversight
Department of Commerce
Department of Health and Human Services
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Health personnel
Higher education
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Military personnel and dependents
National symbols
Physical fitness and lifestyle
Science, technology, communications
Student aid and college costs
Atmospheric science and weather
Congressional oversight
Department of Commerce
Department of Health and Human Services
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Health personnel
Higher education
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Military personnel and dependents
National symbols
Physical fitness and lifestyle
Science, technology, communications
Student aid and college costs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/5426/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr5426/BILLS-113hr5426ih.pdf |