US HB5401 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on September 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 505.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 505.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting the Homeland Act - Terminates the nonimmigrant status of any Libyan national, or of any foreign national acting on behalf of a Libyan entity, who is engaging in aviation maintenance, flight operations, or nuclear-related studies or training. Makes the following benefits unavailable to any Libyan national or any foreign national acting on behalf of a Libyan entity where the purpose is to engage in, or seek to obtain, aviation maintenance, flight operations, or nuclear-related studies or training: application for school transfer, application for extension of stay, employment authorization or practical training, request for reinstatement of student status, or application for change of nonimmigrant status.
Title
Protecting the Homeland Act
Sponsors
Rep. Trey Gowdy [R-SC] | Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] | Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] | Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 505. |
2014-12-12 | House | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 113-673. |
2014-09-10 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 11. |
2014-09-10 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-09-09 | House | Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security Discharged. |
2014-09-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security. |
2014-09-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Subjects
Africa
Area studies and international education
Aviation and airports
Foreign labor
Homeland security
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Libya
Nuclear power
Nuclear weapons
Area studies and international education
Aviation and airports
Foreign labor
Homeland security
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Libya
Nuclear power
Nuclear weapons