US HB5390 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on September 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-06 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 45 - 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-06 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 45 - 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Commerce to conduct a study on the feasibility of manufacturing in the United States products for critical infrastructure sectors, and for other purposes.
Title
Critical Infrastructure Manufacturing Feasibility Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 45 - 0. |
2023-12-05 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-11-02 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote. |
2023-11-02 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-09-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Innovation, Data, and Commerce. |
2023-09-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-09-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/5390/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr5390/BILLS-118hr5390ih.pdf |