US HB5324 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on July 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-11-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-11-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting Athletes, Families and Educators to Protect the Lives of Athletic Youth Act or the SAFE PLAY Act - Amends the Public Health Service Act to require the Director of the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC) to develop public education and awareness materials and resources concerning cardiac health, including: information to increase education and awareness of high risk cardiac conditions and genetic heart rhythm abnormalities that may cause sudden cardiac arrest in children, adolescents, and young adults; sudden cardiac arrest and cardiomyopathy risk assessment worksheets to increase awareness of warning signs of, and increase the likelihood of early detection and treatment of, life-threatening cardiac conditions; training materials for emergency interventions and use of life-saving emergency equipment; and recommendations for how schools, childcare centers, and local youth athletic organizations can develop and implement cardiac emergency response plans. Requires the Director to: (1) provide for dissemination of such information to school personnel, coaches, and families; and (2) develop data collection methods to determine the degree to which such persons have an understanding of cardiac issues. Directs the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to award grants to enable eligible local educational agencies (LEAs) and schools served by such LEAs to purchase AEDs and implement nationally recognized CPR and AED training courses. Amends the Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1965 to require a state, as a condition of receiving funds under such Act, to certify that it requires: (1) LEAs to implement a standard plan for concussion safety and management for public schools; (2) public schools to post information on the symptoms of, the risks posed by, and the actions a student should take in response to, a concussion; (3) public school personnel who suspect a student has sustained a concussion in a school-sponsored activity to notify the parents and prohibit the student from participating in such activity until they receive a written release from a health care professional; and (4) a public school's concussion management team to ensure that a student who has sustained a concussion is receiving appropriate academic supports. Directs the Administrator of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (NOAA) to develop public education and awareness materials and resources to be disseminated to schools regarding risks from exposure to excessive heat and humidity and recommendations for how to avoid heat-related illness. Requires public schools to develop excessive heat action plans for school-sponsored athletic activities. Requires the Director to develop guidelines for the development of emergency action plans for youth athletics. Authorizes the Commissioner of Food and Drugs (FDA) to develop information about the ingredients used in energy drinks and their potential side effects, and recommend guidelines for the safe use of such drinks by youth, for dissemination to public schools. Requires the Director to: (1) expand, intensify, and coordinate CDC activities regarding cardiac conditions, concussions, and heat-related illnesses among youth athletes; and (2) report on fatalities and catastrophic injuries among youths participating an athletic activities.
Title
SAFE PLAY Act
Sponsors
Rep. Lois Capps [D-CA] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] |
Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education. |
2014-08-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2014-07-31 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2014-07-31 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2014-07-31 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2718 (Related) 2014-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB3532 (Related) 2014-01-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
HB3532 (Related) 2014-01-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Atmospheric science and weather
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency communications systems
Emergency medical services and trauma care
First responders and emergency personnel
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Government information and archives
Health
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Medical research
Neurological disorders
Nutrition and diet
Research administration and funding
School administration
School athletics
Special education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Atmospheric science and weather
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency communications systems
Emergency medical services and trauma care
First responders and emergency personnel
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Government information and archives
Health
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Medical research
Neurological disorders
Nutrition and diet
Research administration and funding
School administration
School athletics
Special education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/5324/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr5324/BILLS-113hr5324ih.pdf |