US HB5161 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Enhance Labeling, Accessing, and Branding of Electronic Licenses Act of 2014 or the E-LABEL Act - Amends the Communications Act of 1934 to require the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) to promulgate regulations or take other appropriate action to allow manufacturers of radiofrequency devices with display the option to use electronic labeling for the equipment in place of affixing physical labels to the equipment. Defines "radiofrequency device with display" as any equipment or device that: (1) requires the FCC's authorization before the equipment or device may be marketed or sold within the United States, and (2) is capable of digitally displaying required labeling and regulatory information.
Title
E-LABEL Act
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
Roll Calls
2014-09-11 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 402 N: 0 NV: 29 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2014-09-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-09-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 402 - 0 (Roll no. 496). (text: CR 9/9/2014 H7349) |
2014-09-11 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7438-7439) |
2014-09-09 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2014-09-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5161. |
2014-09-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7349-7350) |
2014-09-09 | House | Mr. Latta moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2014-09-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 426. |
2014-09-08 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 113-575. |
2014-07-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2014-07-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-07-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-07-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2014-07-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2583 (Same As) 2014-12-01 - By Senator Rockefeller from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 113-280.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Computers and information technology
Consumer affairs
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Licensing and registrations
Telephone and wireless communication
Computers and information technology
Consumer affairs
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Licensing and registrations
Telephone and wireless communication