US HB5137 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 43-0)
Status: Introduced on July 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration And Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration And Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Asylum Reform and Border Protection Act of 2014 - Amends the William Wilberforce Trafficking Victims Protection Reauthorization Act of 2008 to direct the Secretary of State to negotiate agreements between the United States and other countries for the repatriation of children. Requires that such agreements protect children from severe forms of trafficking in persons and provide for their safe removal and repatriation. (Current law provides separate procedures for unaccompanied alien children from countries that are or are not contiguous to the United States.) Subjects all children who do not make a claim of asylum or fear of persecution to initial screening and expedited removal. (Maintains the exception for Cuban children arriving by air.) Prohibits the government from bearing any expense of counsel for any person in a removal or related appeal proceedings. Adds an additional requirement in order to establish a credible fear of persecution claim in an asylum interview. Limits humanitarian and public interest parole authority. Prohibits the Secretary of Homeland Security (DHS) from using parole authority for an alien who is ineligible for refugee status. Authorizes the DHS Secretary to designate groups as criminal street gangs. Requires detention for anyone found inadmissible or deportable for criminal street gang membership. Bars individuals found inadmissible or deportable for such membership from asylum, temporary protected status, or special immigrant juvenile status. Amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to revise the definition of "unaccompanied alien child." Prohibits an unaccompanied alien child (UAC) from applying for asylum if such child: (1) may be removed to a safe third country, or (2) has not applied for asylum within one year after arrival in the United States. Provides for additional immigration judges and U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE) attorneys. National Security and Federal Lands Protection Act - Prohibits the Secretary of the Interior or the Secretary of Agriculture (USDA) from restricting specified U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP) activities on federal land within 100 miles of an international land border to: (1) execute search and rescue operations, and (2) prevent unlawful U.S. entries through the international land borders of the United States. Directs the Secretary of State to suspend all foreign assistance to certain countries that refuse to: (1) negotiate a child repatriation agreement, or (2) accept from the United States repatriated unaccompanied alien children who are nationals or residents of the sending country. Permits the use of foreign assistance for repatriation and reintegration purposes.
Title
Asylum Reform and Border Protection Act of 2014
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security. |
2014-07-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security. |
2014-07-18 | House | Provisions of H.R. 2398, as introduced, were included in Sec. 16 of H.R. 5137, as introduced. See also H.R. 2398 under Legislation Referred. |
2014-07-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2014-07-17 | House | Referred to House Homeland Security |
2014-07-17 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2014-07-17 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2014-07-17 | House | Referred to House Foreign Affairs |
2014-07-17 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-07-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2398 (Related) 2013-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Border security and unlawful immigration
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Crimes against children
Crimes against property
Customs enforcement
Department of Homeland Security
Detention of persons
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Evidence and witnesses
Foreign aid and international relief
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
General public lands matters
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Human trafficking
Immigration status and procedures
International affairs
International law and treaties
Judges
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Land use and conservation
Lawyers and legal services
Organized crime
Performance measurement
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Sanctions
Smuggling and trafficking
Terrorism
Violent crime
Visas and passports
Administrative remedies
Border security and unlawful immigration
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Crimes against children
Crimes against property
Customs enforcement
Department of Homeland Security
Detention of persons
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Evidence and witnesses
Foreign aid and international relief
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
General public lands matters
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Human trafficking
Immigration status and procedures
International affairs
International law and treaties
Judges
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Land use and conservation
Lawyers and legal services
Organized crime
Performance measurement
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Sanctions
Smuggling and trafficking
Terrorism
Violent crime
Visas and passports
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/5137/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr5137/BILLS-113hr5137ih.pdf |