US HB4935 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-25 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 680, H.R. 4935 is laid on the table.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-25 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 680, H.R. 4935 is laid on the table.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Child Tax Credit Improvement Act of 2014 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code, with respect to the child tax credit, to: (1) increase from $110,00 to $150,000 ($75,000 for individual taxpayers and married taxpayers filing separately) the threshold amount applicable to married couples filing joint tax returns above which such tax credit is reduced, and (2) allow an inflation adjustment to the threshold amounts and the $1,000 credit amount beginning after 2014. Requires taxpayers to include their social security numbers on their tax returns to claim the refundable portion of the child tax credit. Prohibits the entry of the budgetary effects of this Act on any PAYGO (pay-as-you-go) scorecard.
Title
Child Tax Credit Improvement Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Devin Nunes [R-CA] | Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] |
Roll Calls
2014-07-25 - House - On Passage (Y: 237 N: 173 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-25 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 680, H.R. 4935 is laid on the table. |
2014-07-25 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 680, the text of H.R. 4935 as passed by the House is appended at the end of the engrossment of H.R. 3393 as new matter. |
2014-07-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-07-25 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 237 - 173 (Roll no. 451). (text: CR H6825) |
2014-07-25 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H6832) |
2014-07-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 4935. |
2014-07-25 | House | The rule provides for the consideration of H.R. 3393 and H.R. 4935 under a closed rule. |
2014-07-25 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 680. (consideration: CR H6825-6833) |
2014-07-24 | House | Rule H. Res. 680 passed House. |
2014-07-23 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 680 Reported to House. The rule provides for the consideration of H.R. 3393 and H.R. 4935 under a closed rules. |
2014-07-17 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 393. |
2014-07-17 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 113-527. |
2014-06-25 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 15. |
2014-06-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-06-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HR680 (Related) 2014-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB3393 (Related) 2014-07-29 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 493.
HB3393 (Related) 2014-07-29 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 493.