US HB482 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tyler Clementi Higher Education Anti-Harassment Act of 2013 - Amends title IV (Student Assistance) of the Higher Education Act of 1965 to require each institution of higher education (IHE) participating in a title IV program (except a foreign school) to include in its annual security report a statement of policy regarding harassment that includes: (1) a prohibition of harassment of students by other students, faculty, and staff; (2) a description of its programs to prevent harassment; (3) a description of the procedures that students should follow if harassment occurs; and (4) a description of the procedures it will follow once an incident of harassment has been reported. Defines "harassment" to include certain conduct undertaken through technological means that limits a student's ability to benefit from the IHE's programs, or creates a hostile or abusive educational environment at the school. Authorizes the Secretary of Education to award competitive grants to IHEs to initiate, expand, or improve programs to: (1) prevent the harassment of students; (2) provide counseling or redress services to students who have been harassed or accused of subjecting other students to harassment; and (3) train students, faculty, or staff to prevent harassment or address harassment if it occurs. Directs the Secretary to publish a report of best practices for combating harassment at IHEs.
Title
Tyler Clementi Higher Education Anti-Harassment Act of 2013
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training. |
2013-02-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
Same As/Similar To
SB216 (Same As) 2013-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2164 (Related) 2014-03-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2954 (Related) 2014-11-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2164 (Related) 2014-03-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2954 (Related) 2014-11-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Assault and harassment offenses
Disability and health-based discrimination
Education
Education programs funding
Educational guidance
Government information and archives
Higher education
Racial and ethnic relations
School administration
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Disability and health-based discrimination
Education
Education programs funding
Educational guidance
Government information and archives
Higher education
Racial and ethnic relations
School administration
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/482/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr482/BILLS-113hr482ih.pdf |