US HB4527 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Declares that specified lands in Acadia National Park in Maine, which were conveyed by the National Park Service to the town of Tremont, Maine, for school purposes, shall no longer be required to be used exclusively and perpetually for such purposes, and upon their discontinuance of such a use, shall no longer be required to revert to the United States.
Title
To remove a use restriction on land formerly a part of Acadia National Park that was transferred to the town of Tremont, Maine, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Michaud [D-ME] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2014-09-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-09-08 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7271) |
2014-09-08 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4527. |
2014-09-08 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7271-7272) |
2014-09-08 | House | Mr. Young (AK) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2014-07-17 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 401. |
2014-07-17 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-535. |
2014-06-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-06-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-06-19 | House | Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged. |
2014-06-10 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2014-05-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2014-04-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2803 (Same As) 2014-09-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Educational facilities and institutions
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Maine
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Maine
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources