US HB4429 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-02 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 315.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-02 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 315.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permanent Active Financing Exception Act of 2014 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to make permanent the subpart F foreign personal holding company income exemption for income that is derived in the active conduct of a banking, financing, or similar business, as a securities dealer, or in the conduct of an insurance business.
Title
Permanent Active Financing Exception Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick Tiberi [R-OH] | Rep. Charles Boustany [R-LA] | Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] | Rep. Joseph Crowley [D-NY] |
Rep. Sam Johnson [R-TX] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. John Larson [D-CT] | Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA] |
Rep. Devin Nunes [R-CA] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] | Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL] |
Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Aaron Schock [R-IL] | Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] |
Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 315. |
2014-05-02 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 113-427. |
2014-04-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 14. |
2014-04-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-04-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1859 (Related) 2013-12-20 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 287.
Subjects
Financial services and investments
Foreign and international banking
Foreign and international corporations
Income tax exclusion
Taxation
Taxation of foreign income
Foreign and international banking
Foreign and international corporations
Income tax exclusion
Taxation
Taxation of foreign income