US HB4305 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medical Evaluation Parity for Servicemembers Act of 2014 or the MEPS Act - Directs the Secretary of the military department concerned to: (1) provide an individual with a mental health assessment before such individual enlists or is commissioned as an officer in an Armed Force, and (2) use such results as a baseline for any subsequent mental health examinations. Prohibits the Secretary from considering the results of such assessment in determining the assignment or promotion of a member of the Armed Forces. Directs the Secretary to treat such assessment in the same manner as medical records with respect to laws and regulations relating to the privacy of information. Requires the National Institute of Mental Health of the National Institutes of Health (NIH) to submit to Congress and the Secretary of Defense (DOD) a report on preliminary mental health assessments of members of the Armed Forces, including recommendations regarding: (1) establishing a preliminary mental health assessment of members of the Armed Forces to establish parity with physical screenings; and (2) the composition of the mental health assessment, best practices, and how to track assessment changes relating to traumatic brain injuries, post-traumatic stress disorder, and other conditions.
Title
Medical Evaluation Parity for Servicemembers Act of 2014
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2014-04-10 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3148) |
2014-04-09 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3065) |
2014-03-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2231 (Related) 2014-04-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Health information and medical records
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Military medicine
Military personnel and dependents
Right of privacy
Health information and medical records
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Military medicine
Military personnel and dependents
Right of privacy
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/4305/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr4305/BILLS-113hr4305ih.pdf |