US HB4272 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-10 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-10 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Forest Access in Rural Communities Act - Directs the Secretary of Agriculture (USDA), through the Forest Service, to cease all implementation and enforcement of the travel management rule for units of the National Forest System derived from the public domain to the extent that it will, or can reasonably be expected to, alter public access to such lands. Requires the Secretary, as a condition on the preparation of an environmental impact statement or environmental assessment under the National Environmental Policy Act of 1969 for a proposed access travel management action, to consult with affected counties for the purpose of incorporating their needs, uses, and input. Bars the Secretary from implementing an access travel management action unless and until the Secretary: (1) complies with the consultation requirement imposed by this Act, and (2) obtains the concurrence of each affected county for the implementation of such action.
Title
Forest Access in Rural Communities Act
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] | Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] | Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] |
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] | Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] |
Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] | Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] |
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2014-03-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2014-03-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5598 (Related) 2014-10-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Subjects
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Forests, forestry, trees
Intergovernmental relations
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Roads and highways
State and local government operations
Travel and tourism
Forests, forestry, trees
Intergovernmental relations
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Roads and highways
State and local government operations
Travel and tourism
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/4272/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr4272/BILLS-113hr4272ih.pdf |