US HB4156 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-20)
Status: Engrossed on July 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Transparent Airfares Act of 2014 - Declares that it shall not be an unfair or deceptive practice for an air carrier or other covered entity to state the base airfare in an advertisement or solicitation for passenger air transportation if it clearly and separately discloses: (1) the government-imposed taxes and fees for the air transportation, and (2) its total cost. Defines "base airfare" to mean the cost of passenger air transportation, excluding government-imposed taxes and fees. Defines "covered entity" as an air carrier, including an indirect air carrier, foreign carrier, ticket agent, or other person offering to sell tickets for passenger air transportation or a tour or tour component that must be purchased with air transportation.
Title
Transparent Airfares Act of 2014
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2014-07-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-07-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6866) |
2014-07-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4156. |
2014-07-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6866-6868) |
2014-07-28 | House | Mr. Shuster moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2014-07-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 414. |
2014-07-24 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 113-554. |
2014-04-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2014-04-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-04-09 | House | Subcommittee on Aviation Discharged. |
2014-03-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Consumer affairs
Internet and video services
Marketing and advertising
Sales and excise taxes
Transportation and public works
Transportation costs
Travel and tourism
Consumer affairs
Internet and video services
Marketing and advertising
Sales and excise taxes
Transportation and public works
Transportation costs
Travel and tourism