US HB3722 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To require a pilot program on activities under the pre-separation transition process of members of the Armed Forces for a reduction in suicide among veterans, and for other purposes.
Title
Daniel J. Harvey, Jr. and Adam Lambert Improving Servicemember Transition to Reduce Veteran Suicide Act
Sponsors
Rep. Zachary Nunn [R-IA] | Rep. Seth Magaziner [D-RI] | Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] | Rep. Donald Davis [D-NC] |
Rep. Jennifer Kiggans [R-VA] | Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] |
Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Greg Murphy [R-NC] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2024-04-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-04-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2691) |
2024-04-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3722. |
2024-04-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2691-2693) |
2024-04-29 | House | Mrs. Kiggans (VA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2024-02-13 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 118-380, Part I. |
2023-12-05 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2023-12-05 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-11-15 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2023-11-15 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-11-02 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2023-07-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2023-05-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-05-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB132 (Related) 2023-02-16 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.