US HB3720 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, And The Internet Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, And The Internet Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Next Generation Television Marketplace Act - Repeals provisions of the Communications Act of 1934 concerning: (1) the carriage of distant television stations and significantly viewed signals by satellite carriers, (2) the retransmittal of television signals to eligible state counties in the designated market area of another state by cable operators or satellite carriers, (3) the Federal Communications Commission's (FCC) qualified carrier certification process, (4) the designation of cable channels for commercial video programming use, (5) the carriage of local commercial television signals and qualified low power stations by cable operators, (6) the FCC's authority to adopt syndicated exclusivity rules for private home viewing of secondary transmissions by satellite of broadcast station signals, and (7) the requirement that cable systems or other multichannel video programming distributors obtain consent to retransmit a broadcasting station signal. Repeals and revises provisions concerning: (1) the carriage of local television signals by satellite carriers, and (2) the regulation of rates and broadcast signal carriage. Makes several existing requirements concerning the carriage of local television broadcast stations applicable only to qualified noncommercial educational television stations. Repeals federal copyright laws requiring statutory licenses for certain secondary transmissions of distant and local television programming by satellite carriers. Eliminates certain categories of remedies relating to alteration of programming violations by cable systems. Extends exemptions from copyright infringement laws to certain secondary transmissions by cable systems and satellite carriers. Repeals provisions concerning cable system: (1) nonsimultaneous transmission infringement, and (2) statutory licenses for secondary transmissions. Directs the FCC to repeal related FCC rules and eliminate: (1) restrictions on the number of broadcast television stations that a person or entity may own, operate, or control in the same designated market area under the local television multiple ownership rule; (2) the radio-television cross-ownership rule; and (3) limitations on the direct or indirect ownership, operation, or control of a broadcast television station by a person or entity that owns, operates, or controls a daily newspaper under the daily newspaper cross-ownership rule. Requires this Act to take effect on January 1, 2018.
Title
Next Generation Television Marketplace Act
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet. |
2013-12-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2013-12-12 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-12-12 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2013-12-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Competition and antitrust
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Intellectual property
Licensing and registrations
News media and reporting
Science, technology, communications
Telecommunication rates and fees
Television and film
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Competition and antitrust
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Intellectual property
Licensing and registrations
News media and reporting
Science, technology, communications
Telecommunication rates and fees
Television and film
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/3720/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr3720/BILLS-113hr3720ih.pdf |