US HB3678 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-8)
Status: Introduced on December 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-11-12 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 142.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-11-12 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 142.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Redesignates the lock and dam located in Modoc, Illinois, commonly known as the Kaskaskia Lock and Dam, as the "Jerry F. Costello Lock and Dam."
Title
To redesignate the lock and dam located in Modoc, Illinois, commonly known as the Kaskaskia Lock and Dam, as the "Jerry F. Costello Lock and Dam", and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. William Enyart [D-IL] | Rep. Timothy Bishop [D-NY] | Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] | Rep. Michael Capuano [D-MA] |
Rep. Howard Coble [R-NC] | Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] |
Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Rep. John Duncan [R-TN] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] |
Rep. Luis Gutierrez [D-IL] | Rep. Randy Hultgren [R-IL] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] |
Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] | Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL] |
Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. Aaron Schock [R-IL] |
Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] | Rep. John Tierney [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-12 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 142. |
2014-11-12 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 113-608. |
2014-03-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2014-03-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-03-13 | House | Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged. |
2013-12-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2013-12-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Dams and canals
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Illinois
Marine and inland water transportation
Transportation and public works
Dams and canals
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Illinois
Marine and inland water transportation
Transportation and public works