US HB3670 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-9)
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Anti-Spoofing Act of 2014 - Amends the Communications Act of 1934 to expand the prohibition on the provision of inaccurate caller identification information (which makes it unlawful to cause a caller identification service to knowingly transmit misleading or inaccurate caller identification information with the intent to defraud, cause harm, or wrongfully obtain anything of value) to persons outside the United States if the recipient is within the United States. Revises the definitions of "caller identification information" and "caller identification service" to include text messages sent using a text messaging service. Defines "text message" as real-time or near real-time messages consisting of text, images, sounds, or other information transmitted from or received by a device identified by a telephone number. Excludes from such definition a real-time, two-way voice or video communication. Expands the categories of IP-enabled voice services that are subject to such prohibition to include services with interconnection capability, whether part of a bundle of services or separately, that can originate traffic to the public switched telephone network.
Title
Anti-Spoofing Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Joe Barton [R-TX] | Rep. Bruce Braley [D-IA] | Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] |
Rep. John Delaney [D-MD] | Rep. John Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Donna Edwards [D-MD] | Rep. Renee Ellmers [R-NC] |
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] |
Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Billy Long [R-MO] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] |
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] |
Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD] | Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] |
Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2014-09-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-09-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7347) |
2014-09-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3670. |
2014-09-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7347-7349) |
2014-09-09 | House | Mr. Barton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2014-09-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 423. |
2014-09-08 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 113-572. |
2014-07-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2014-07-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-07-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-12-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2013-12-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2787 (Related) 2014-09-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB2956 (Related) 2014-11-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6208-6209)
SB3010 (Related) 2014-12-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB2956 (Related) 2014-11-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6208-6209)
SB3010 (Related) 2014-12-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Consumer affairs
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
Consumer affairs
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication