US HB3635 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 126-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Safe and Secure Federal Websites Act of 2014 - (Sec. 2) Prohibits a federal agency from deploying or making available to the public a new federal personally identifiable information website (new Federal PII Website) until the chief information officer of the agency submits a certification to Congress that the website is fully functional and secure, as those terms are defined by this Act. Defines "new Federal PII website" as a website that: (1) is operated by (or under contract with) an agency; (2) elicits, collects, stores, or maintains personally identifiable information (i.e., information that can be used to identify an individual, such as a social security number, a date and place of birth, a mother's maiden name, biometric records, or other information linked to an individual); and (3) is first made accessible to the public and collects or stores personally identifiable information on or after October 1, 2012. Exempts beta websites designed for testing and development if users execute an agreement acknowledging the risks involved. (Sec. 3) Directs the Director of the Office of Management and Budget (OMB) to establish and oversee policies and procedures for federal agencies to follow in the event of a breach of information security involving the disclosure of personally identifiable information, including: (1) notice, not later than 72 hours after discovery of a breach or possible breach, to individuals whose personally identifiable information could be compromised as a result of such breach; (2) timely reporting to a federal cyber security center designated by this Act; and (3) any additional actions that the Director finds necessary and appropriate. Requires: (1) agency heads to ensure that agency actions taken in response to a breach comply with OMB policies and procedures established by this Act; and (2) the OMB Director to report to Congress, not later than March 1 of each year, on agency compliance with such policies and procedures.
Title
Safe and Secure Federal Websites Act of 2014
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2014-07-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-07-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6935-6936) |
2014-07-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3635. |
2014-07-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6935-6936) |
2014-07-28 | House | Mr. Bentivolio moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2014-07-28 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 421. |
2014-07-28 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 113-562. |
2014-03-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2014-03-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-12-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
Subjects
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Internet and video services
Right of privacy
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Internet and video services
Right of privacy