US HB3614 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Military Skills to Careers Act - Requires a state, as a condition for receipt of a grant or contract from the Department of Labor to employ disabled veterans' outreach program specialists and local veterans' employment representatives, to establish a program under which that state administers an examination and issues a license or credential to a veteran without requiring any training or apprenticeship if such veteran: (1) receives a satisfactory score on such examination, (2) has been awarded a military occupational specialty that is substantially equivalent to or exceeds the state requirements for such license or credential, (3) has engaged in active practice of such occupation for at least two of the five years preceding the date of application for such license or credential, and (4) pays any fees required by the state for such license or credential. Requires the state to report annually to the Secretary of Labor on the exams administered, the number of veterans who completed such exams, and exam results, disaggregated by occupational field. Allows the Secretary to waive the requirement that a state establish such a program if the state certifies that it: (1) takes into account previous military training or testing; (2) permits veterans to satisfy through examination training or testing requirements for which a veteran has previously completed military training; and (3) substantially reduces training time, based on the military training received by a veteran, required to satisfy requirements the veteran is unable to completely satisfy through examination. Requires an annual report from the Secretary to Congress and the Secretary of Defense on administered exams and exam results.
Title
Military Skills to Careers Act
Sponsors
Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-12-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2013-11-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3007 (Related) 2013-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
SB492 (Related) 2013-06-12 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-111.
SB495 (Related) 2013-06-12 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-111.
SB944 (Related) 2013-12-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 258.
SB1950 (Related) 2014-02-04 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S736)
SB1982 (Related) 2014-02-27 - S.AMDT.2766 SA 2766 fell when SA 2747 fell. (consideration: CR S1210)
SB492 (Related) 2013-06-12 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-111.
SB495 (Related) 2013-06-12 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-111.
SB944 (Related) 2013-12-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 258.
SB1950 (Related) 2014-02-04 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S736)
SB1982 (Related) 2014-02-27 - S.AMDT.2766 SA 2766 fell when SA 2747 fell. (consideration: CR S1210)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Licensing and registrations
Military education and training
State and local government operations
User charges and fees
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Licensing and registrations
Military education and training
State and local government operations
User charges and fees
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/3614/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr3614/BILLS-113hr3614ih.pdf |