US HB3606 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-15 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 442.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-15 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 442.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Emigrant Wilderness Historical Use Preservation Act of 2013 - Declares that this Act modifies and supplements federal law applicable to the Emigrant Wilderness of the Stanislaus National Forest in California. Directs the Secretary of Agriculture (USDA) to ensure that, within the Emigrant Wilderness, the level of use, allotted user days, and activities by commercial outfitters and guides shall not rise above or be restricted below the historical level of use, allotted user days, and activities by commercial outfitters and guides within that area that existed as of the original designation of the Wilderness on January 3, 1975. Prohibits any increase or reduction in the level of commercial pack and saddle stock use from the highest level of such use in the preceding 10 years. Allows the historical use of trails, roads, paths, campsites, meadows, and cross-country areas in the Wilderness by recreational and commercial pack and saddle stock to continue. States that the use of drift fences that are in existence or were previously in existence at the time of the Wilderness' designation shall be allowed and maintained.
Title
Emigrant Wilderness Historical Use Preservation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Jeff Denham [R-CA] | Rep. Devin Nunes [R-CA] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-15 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 442. |
2014-09-15 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-595. |
2014-05-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2014-05-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-05-29 | House | Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged. |
2014-03-06 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-11-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2013-11-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Subjects
California
Forests, forestry, trees
Land use and conservation
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Travel and tourism
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Forests, forestry, trees
Land use and conservation
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Travel and tourism
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats