US HB3510 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Multinational Species Conservation Funds Semipostal Stamp Reauthorization Act - Amends the Multinational Species Conservation Funds Semipostal Stamp Act of 2010 to require such stamp to be: (1) made available to the public for an additional four years; and (2) offered in a a choice of five versions depicting an African or Asian elephant, a rhinoceros, a tiger, a marine turtle, or a great ape.
Title
Multinational Species Conservation Funds Semipostal Stamp Reauthorization Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs. |
2011-11-29 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2011-11-29 | House | Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform |
2011-11-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3208 (Related) 2012-09-14 - Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security.
SB3525 (Related) 2012-11-26 - Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 504.
SB3525 (Related) 2012-11-26 - Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 504.
Subjects
Endangered and threatened species
Government operations and politics
Government trust funds
Mammals
Postal service
Reptiles
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Government operations and politics
Government trust funds
Mammals
Postal service
Reptiles
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/3510/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr3510/BILLS-112hr3510ih.pdf |