US HB3397 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Hearing: Jun 1 @ 1:00 am in H-313, CAPITOL
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Hearing: Jun 1 @ 1:00 am in H-313, CAPITOL
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Director of the Bureau of Land Management to withdraw a rule of the Bureau of Land Management relating to conservation and landscape health.
Title
WEST Act of 2024 Western Economic Security Today Act of 2024
Sponsors
Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] | Rep. Russ Fulcher [R-ID] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Harriet Hageman [R-WY] |
Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] |
Rep. Blake Moore [R-UT] | Rep. Burgess Owens [R-UT] | Rep. Cliff Bentz [R-OR] | Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] |
Rep. Matt Rosendale [R-MT] | Rep. Ryan Zinke [R-MT] | Rep. Lauren Boebert [R-CO] | Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID] |
Rep. Andrew Ogles [R-TN] | Rep. John Duarte [R-CA] | Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND] | Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD] |
Rep. Celeste Maloy [R-UT] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - House - On Passage RC# 165 (Y: 212 N: 202 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - On Motion to Recommit RC# 164 (Y: 204 N: 210 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2024-04-30 - House - On Motion to Recommit RC# 164 (Y: 204 N: 210 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2024-04-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-04-30 | House | On passage Passed by recorded vote: 212 - 202 (Roll no. 165). (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H2740) |
2024-04-30 | House | On motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 204 - 210 (Roll no. 164). |
2024-04-30 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to clause 2(b) of rule XIX. |
2024-04-30 | House | Ms. Kamlager-Dove moved to recommit to the Committee on Natural Resources. (text: CR H2748) |
2024-04-30 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2024-04-30 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3397. |
2024-04-30 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 615, H.R. 2925, H.R. 3195, H.R. 764, H.R. 3397, H.R. 6285 and H.R. 6090. The rule provides for consideration of H.R. 615, H.R. 2925, H.R. 3195, H.R. 764, H.R. 3397, and H.R. 6090 under a closed rule, and H.R. 6285 under a structured rule. The rule provides for one hour of general debate and one motion to recommit on each bill. |
2024-04-30 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1173. (consideration: CR H2740-2750) |
2024-04-29 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1173 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 615, H.R. 2925, H.R. 3195, H.R. 764, H.R. 3397, H.R. 6285 and H.R. 6090. The rule provides for consideration of H.R. 615, H.R. 2925, H.R. 3195, H.R. 764, H.R. 3397, and H.R. 6090 under a closed rule, and H.R. 6285 under a structured rule. The rule provides for one hour of general debate and one motion to recommit on each bill. |
2024-02-09 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 309. |
2024-02-09 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 118-378. |
2023-06-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-06-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 20 - 16. |
2023-06-15 | House | Committee Hearings Held |
2023-05-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-05-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1435 (Same As) 2023-05-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HR1173 (Related) 2024-04-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1173 (Related) 2024-04-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.