US HB3200 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Energy Policy and Conservation Act to establish a program to provide loans to implement cost-effective energy efficiency measures, and for other purposes.
Title
Community Energy Savings Program Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] | Rep. Kathy Manning [D-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2021-05-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-05-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1632 (Same As) 2021-05-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB2234 (Related) 2021-06-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5385 (Related) 2021-09-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
SB2234 (Related) 2021-06-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5385 (Related) 2021-09-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/3200/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr3200/BILLS-117hr3200ih.pdf |