US HB3195 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Hearing: Jun 1 @ 1:00 am in H-313, CAPITOL
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Hearing: Jun 1 @ 1:00 am in H-313, CAPITOL
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To rescind Public Land Order 7917, to reinstate mineral leases and permits in the Superior National Forest, to ensure timely review of Mine Plans of Operations, and for other purposes.
Title
Superior National Forest Restoration Act
Sponsors
Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] | Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Ryan Zinke [R-MT] |
Rep. Carlos Gimenez [R-FL] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Lauren Boebert [R-CO] | Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] |
Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] | Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] | Rep. John Duarte [R-CA] | Rep. Harriet Hageman [R-WY] |
Rep. Michelle Fischbach [R-MN] | Rep. Brad Finstad [R-MN] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - House - On Passage RC# 171 (Y: 212 N: 203 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - On Motion to Recommit RC# 170 (Y: 205 N: 210 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2024-04-30 - House - On Motion to Recommit RC# 170 (Y: 205 N: 210 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2024-04-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-04-30 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 212 - 203 (Roll no. 171). (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H2718) |
2024-04-30 | House | On motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 205 - 210 (Roll no. 170). |
2024-04-30 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2752-2754) |
2024-04-30 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 3195, the Chair put the question on the motion to recommit and by voice vote announced that the noes had prevailed. Ms. McCollum demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2024-04-30 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to clause 2(b) of rule XIX. |
2024-04-30 | House | Ms. McCollum moved to recommit to the Committee on Natural Resources. (text: CR H2728) |
2024-04-30 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2024-04-30 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3195. |
2024-04-30 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 615, H.R. 2925, H.R. 3195, H.R. 764, H.R. 3397, H.R. 6285 and H.R. 6090. The rule provides for consideration of H.R. 615, H.R. 2925, H.R. 3195, H.R. 764, H.R. 3397, and H.R. 6090 under a closed rule, and H.R. 6285 under a structured rule. The rule provides for one hour of general debate and one motion to recommit on each bill. |
2024-04-30 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1173. (consideration: CR H2718-2728) |
2024-04-29 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1173 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 615, H.R. 2925, H.R. 3195, H.R. 764, H.R. 3397, H.R. 6285 and H.R. 6090. The rule provides for consideration of H.R. 615, H.R. 2925, H.R. 3195, H.R. 764, H.R. 3397, and H.R. 6090 under a closed rule, and H.R. 6285 under a structured rule. The rule provides for one hour of general debate and one motion to recommit on each bill. |
2024-02-09 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 308. |
2024-02-09 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 118-377. |
2023-05-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 17. |
2023-05-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-05-17 | House | Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged. |
2023-05-11 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2023-05-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2023-05-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-05-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR1173 (Related) 2024-04-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.