US HB3130 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-10-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration And Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-10-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration And Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protect Family Values at the Border Act - Directs the Secretary of Homeland Security (DHS) to: (1) consider safety and family concerns in any action related to the repatriation or prosecution of individuals apprehended for immigration violations, and (2) provide related training for U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP) and cooperating entity personnel. Directs the Secretary, with certain exceptions, to submit to Congress every 180 days written certification that DHS has deported or otherwise removed an apprehended individual from the United States through an entry or exit point on the southern border only during daylight hours. Directs the Secretary to promulgate regulations establishing short-term custody standards providing for basic minimums of care at all CBP facilities holding individuals in CBP custody.
Title
Protect Family Values at the Border Act
Sponsors
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Beto O'Rourke [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security. |
2013-09-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security. |
2013-09-18 | House | Referred to House Homeland Security |
2013-09-18 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-09-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB744 (Related) 2014-12-10 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Border security and unlawful immigration
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of Homeland Security
Detention of persons
Family relationships
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Immigrant health and welfare
Immigration status and procedures
Border security and unlawful immigration
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of Homeland Security
Detention of persons
Family relationships
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Immigrant health and welfare
Immigration status and procedures
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/3130/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr3130/BILLS-113hr3130ih.pdf |