US HB2989 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Forestry.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Forestry.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To improve the health and resiliency of giant sequoias, and for other purposes.
Title
Save Our Sequoias Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Forestry. |
2023-05-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2023-05-17 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2023-05-10 | House | Committee Hearings Held. |
2023-05-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2023-04-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-04-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/2989/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr2989/BILLS-118hr2989ih.pdf |