US HB2981 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-05 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-05 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Technology and Research Accelerating National Security and Future Economic Resiliency Act of 2013 or the TRANSFER Act of 2013 - Amends the Small Business Act to replace provisions requiring the Director of the National Institutes of Health to use funds for a Proof of Concept Partnership pilot program to accelerate the creation of small businesses and the commercialization of research innovations made by certain institutions with provisions directing each federal agency required to establish a small business technology transfer (STTR) program to carry out an Innovative Approaches to Technology Transfer Grant Program to support innovative approaches to technology transfer at institutions of higher education, nonprofit research institutions, and federal laboratories in order to accelerate the commercialization of federally funded research and technology by small businesses. Outlines activities eligible for funding, application requirements, and award procedures and amounts. Requires successful grant proposals to include a plan to assemble a program oversight board to establish award programs for individual projects and evaluate project applications. Provides the percentage of each agency's extramural budget to be expended on such Program for FY2014-FY2017. Directs each agency to: (1) develop a Program evaluation plan and collect information from grantees annually to evaluate the Program, and (2) submit a Program activities report to specified congressional committees. Requires the Administrator of the Small Business Administration (SBA) to include information on the Program on the public database of small businesses participating in STTR or Small Business Innovation Research programs.
Title
Technology and Research Accelerating National Security and Future Economic Resiliency Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] | Rep. Ron Barber [D-AZ] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Timothy Bishop [D-NY] |
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] |
Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] | Rep. Ralph Hall [R-TX] | Rep. Richard Hanna [R-NY] |
Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. Randy Hultgren [R-IL] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA] |
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] |
Rep. Mike McIntyre [D-NC] | Rep. William Owens [D-NY] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] |
Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-05 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2013-12-05 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-09-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology. |
2013-08-02 | House | Referred to House Science, Space, and Technology |
2013-08-02 | House | Referred to House Small Business |
2013-08-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4186 (Related) 2014-05-28 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
SB2551 (Related) 2014-06-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
SB2551 (Related) 2014-06-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Commerce
Education programs funding
Government information and archives
Higher education
Performance measurement
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Small business
Technology transfer and commercialization
Commerce
Education programs funding
Government information and archives
Higher education
Performance measurement
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Small business
Technology transfer and commercialization
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2981/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2981/BILLS-113hr2981ih.pdf |