US HB2890 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
District of Columbia Incentives for Business and Individual Investment Act - Amends the Internal Revenue Code, with respect to tax incentives for investment in the District of Columbia, to: (1) reauthorize provisions for designating a District of Columbia Enterprise Zone and extend the deadline for such designation until December 31, 2015; (2) reauthorize the issuance authority for District of Columbia tax-exempt economic development bonds and extend until December 31, 2015, the deadline for issuing such bonds; (3) extend through 2014 the period for acquiring DC Zone assets (i.e., DC Zone business stock, partnership interests, and business property) eligible for an exemption from capital gains tax and through 2020 the period during which gain from the sale of such assets shall qualify for such exemption; and (4) extend through December 31, 2014, the deadline for purchasing a residence in the District of Columbia to qualify for the first-time District of Columbia homebuyers tax credit.
Title
District of Columbia Incentives for Business and Individual Investment Act
Sponsors
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-31 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2013-07-31 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1173-1174) |
Same As/Similar To
HB3272 (Related) 2013-10-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
Business investment and capital
Capital gains tax
District of Columbia
Economic development
Housing finance and home ownership
Income tax credits
Income tax exclusion
Securities
State and local finance
Taxation
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Capital gains tax
District of Columbia
Economic development
Housing finance and home ownership
Income tax credits
Income tax exclusion
Securities
State and local finance
Taxation
Urban and suburban affairs and development
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2890/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2890/BILLS-113hr2890ih.pdf |