US HB2818 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on July 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Workforce Protections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Workforce Protections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Surveillance State Repeal Act - Repeals the USA PATRIOT Act and the FISA Amendments Act of 2008 (thereby restoring or reviving provisions amended or repealed by such Acts as if such Acts had not been enacted), except with respect to reports to Congress regarding court orders under the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Act of 1978 (FISA) and the acquisition of intelligence information concerning an entity not substantially composed of U.S. persons that is engaged in the international proliferation of weapons of mass destruction. Extends from 7 to 10 years the maximum term of FISA judges. Makes such judges eligible for redesignation. Permits FISA courts to appoint special masters to advise on technical issues raised during proceedings. Requires orders approving certain electronic surveillance to direct that, upon request of the applicant, any person or entity must furnish all information, facilities, or technical assistance necessary to accomplish such surveillance in a manner to protect its secrecy and produce a minimum of interference with the services that such carrier, landlord, custodian, or other person is providing the target of such surveillance (thereby retaining the ability to conduct surveillance on such targets regardless of the type of communications methods or devices being used by the subject of the surveillance). Prohibits information relating to a U.S. person from being acquired pursuant to FISA without a valid warrant based on probable cause. Prohibits the federal government from requiring manufacturers of electronic devices and related software to build in mechanisms allowing the federal government to bypass encryption or privacy technology. Directs the Comptroller General (GAO) to report annually on the federal government's compliance with FISA. Permits an employee of or contractor to an element of the intelligence community with knowledge of FISA-authorized programs and activities to submit a covered complaint to the Comptroller General, to the House or Senate intelligence committees, or in accordance with a process under the National Security Act of 1947 with respect to reports made to the Inspector General of the Intelligence Community. Defines a "covered complaint" as a complaint or information concerning FISA-authorized programs and activities that an employee or contractor reasonably believes is evidence of: (1) a violation of any law, rule, or regulation; or (2) gross mismanagement, a gross waste of funds, an abuse of authority, or a substantial and specific danger to public health or safety. Subjects an officer or employee of an element of the intelligence community to administrative sanctions, including termination, for taking retaliatory action against an employee or contractor who seeks to disclose, or who discloses, such information.
Title
Surveillance State Repeal Act
Sponsors
Rep. Rush Holt [D-NJ] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX] |
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] |
Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. John Tierney [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections. |
2013-09-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2013-07-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2013-07-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. |
2013-07-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2013-07-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2013-07-24 | House | Referred to House Armed Services |
2013-07-24 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2013-07-24 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2013-07-24 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2013-07-24 | House | Referred to House Foreign Affairs |
2013-07-24 | House | Referred to House Financial Services |
2013-07-24 | House | Referred to House Intelligence (Permanent Select) |
2013-07-24 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-07-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Intelligence (Permanent Select), Financial Services, Foreign Affairs, Energy and Commerce, Education and the Workforce, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Evidence and witnesses
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Judges
Manufacturing
Public contracts and procurement
Right of privacy
Specialized courts
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Evidence and witnesses
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Judges
Manufacturing
Public contracts and procurement
Right of privacy
Specialized courts
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2818/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2818/BILLS-113hr2818ih.pdf |