US HB2809 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 134-0)
Status: Introduced on July 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Delays for one year the effective date of any provisions of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act or of any health care provisions of the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2011 that were scheduled to take effect on or after January 1, 2014. Suspends for one year, beginning January 1, 2014, any tax or tax increase imposed by such provisions if the tax or increase takes effect before that date.
Title
To delay the application of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2013-07-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-07-24 | House | Referred to House Appropriations |
2013-07-24 | House | Referred to House House Administration |
2013-07-24 | House | Referred to House Rules |
2013-07-24 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2013-07-24 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-07-24 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2013-07-24 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2013-07-24 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2013-07-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and the Workforce, the Judiciary, Natural Resources, Rules, House Administration, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1490 (Same As) 2013-09-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Comprehensive health care
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Sales and excise taxes
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Sales and excise taxes
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2809/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2809/BILLS-113hr2809ih.pdf |