US HB2805 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Heroin and Prescription Opioid Abuse Prevention, Education, and Enforcement Act of 2015 This bill requires the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS), in cooperation with the Department of Veterans Affairs, the Department of Defense, and the Drug Enforcement Administration (DEA), to convene a Pain Management Best Practices Inter-Agency Task Force to develop and study best practices for pain management and prescription of pain medication. This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to revise and extend through FY2020 the controlled substance monitoring program. Government entities receiving nonidentifiable information from a controlled substance monitoring database for research purposes may make that information available to other entities for research purposes. A state receiving a grant for a controlled substance monitoring program must: (1) facilitate prescriber and dispenser use of the state's controlled substance monitoring system, and (2) educate prescribers and dispensers on the benefits of the system. This bill amends the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to extend the Edward Byrne Memorial Justice Assistance Grant Program through FY2020. HHS must advance education and awareness of the risk of abuse of prescription opioids (drugs with effects similar to opium). The Office of National Drug Control Policy (ONDCP), in coordination with HHS and the DEA, must establish a national drug awareness campaign that emphasizes the similarities between heroin and prescription opioids. The DEA, in coordination with HHS and ONDCP, may make grants to state, local, or tribal governments to create demonstration programs to allow first responders to prevent opioid overdose death by administering an opioid overdose reversal drug (e.g., naloxone).
Title
Heroin and Prescription Opioid Abuse Prevention, Education, and Enforcement Act of 2015
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2015-06-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-06-17 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-06-17 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-06-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-06-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1134 (Related) 2015-04-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1725 (Related) 2015-09-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB1725 (Related) 2015-09-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Drug therapy
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Emergency medical services and trauma care
First responders and emergency personnel
Government information and archives
Health
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Law enforcement administration and funding
Medical research
Prescription drugs
State and local government operations
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Drug therapy
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Emergency medical services and trauma care
First responders and emergency personnel
Government information and archives
Health
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Law enforcement administration and funding
Medical research
Prescription drugs
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/2805/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr2805/BILLS-114hr2805ih.pdf |