US HB2791 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-6)
Status: Introduced on July 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Responsible Electronics Recycling Act - Amends the Solid Waste Disposal Act to: (1) prohibit the export of restricted electronic waste to countries that are not members of the Organization for Economic Cooperation and Development (OECD) or the European Union (EU), or Liechtenstein; (2) require the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to develop and promulgate procedures for identifying certain electronic equipment as well as additional restricted toxic materials contained in such equipment which poses a potential hazard to human health or the environment; and (3) establish criminal penalties for knowingly exporting restricted electronic waste in violation of this Act. Allows certain exceptions to such export ban. Defines "restricted electronic waste" to include electronic equipment (excluding parts of a motor vehicle), such as computers, televisions, printers, copiers, video game systems, telephones, and similar used electronic products, that contain cathode ray tubes, batteries, switches, and other parts containing lead, cadmium, mercury, organic solvents, hexavalent chromium, beryllium, or other toxic ingredients. Requires persons who handle restricted electronic wastes to permit appropriate EPA and state officials access to such wastes upon request. Directs the Secretary of Energy to establish a competitive research application program to provide grants for research in the recovering and recycling of critical minerals and rare earth elements found in electronic devices.
Title
Responsible Electronics Recycling Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] | Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] | Rep. Dan Benishek [R-MI] | Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] |
Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Jeff Denham [R-CA] | Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] | Rep. Christopher Gibson [R-NY] |
Rep. Richard Hanna [R-NY] | Rep. Rush Holt [D-NJ] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] |
Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Tim Murphy [R-PA] | Rep. Richard Nugent [R-FL] | Rep. Mike J. Rogers [R-MI] |
Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD] | Rep. Bill Shuster [R-PA] | Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] |
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment. |
2013-09-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2013-07-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy. |
2013-07-23 | House | Referred to House Science, Space, and Technology |
2013-07-23 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2013-07-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2090 (Same As) 2014-03-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Business records
Computers and information technology
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Licensing and registrations
Materials
Metals
Research administration and funding
Solid waste and recycling
Trade restrictions
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Business records
Computers and information technology
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Licensing and registrations
Materials
Metals
Research administration and funding
Solid waste and recycling
Trade restrictions
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2791/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2791/BILLS-113hr2791ih.pdf |