US HB2453 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 93-19-1)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medicare Beneficiary Preservation of Choice Act of 2013 - Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act, as amended by the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act, to repeal the allowance for disenrollment, between January 1 and March 15 of each year, only from an MedicareAdvantage plan to elect enrollment in the original Medicare fee-for-service program. Restores the option under previous law to elect to change from a MedicareAdvantage to the original Medicare fee-for-service plan, or from the original Medicare fee-for-service to a MedicareAdvantage plan, once a year during the first three months.
Title
Medicare Beneficiary Preservation of Choice Act of 2013
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-06-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-06-20 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2013-06-20 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2013-06-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2753 (Related) 2013-07-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2453/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2453/BILLS-113hr2453ih.pdf |