US HB2291 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-7)
Status: Passed on August 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-08 - Became Public Law No: 113-149.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-7)
Status: Passed on August 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-08 - Became Public Law No: 113-149.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 450 Lexington Avenue in New York, New York, as the "Vincent R. Sombrotto Post Office."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 450 Lexington Avenue in New York, New York, as the "Vincent R. Sombrotto Post Office".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-08 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-149. |
2014-08-08 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2014-08-01 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-08-01 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5330) |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 509. |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Carper without amendment. Without written report. |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2014-07-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2014-07-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-07-14 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6160) |
2014-07-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2291. |
2014-07-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6160-6161) |
2014-07-14 | House | Mr. Gosar moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2014-05-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-05-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-06-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2013-06-06 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E826) |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
New York State
Postal service
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
New York State
Postal service