US HB2248 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ban Poisonous Additives Act of 2013 - Prohibits the distribution of a food if its container is composed, in whole or in part, of bisphenol A (BPA) or can release BPA into food. Authorizes the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to grant one-year renewable waivers to a facility for a particular container if such facility: (1) demonstrates that it is not technologically feasible to replace BPA in the container or to use an alternative container that does not contain BPA, and (2) submits to the Secretary a plan and timeline for removing BPA from such container. Sets forth labeling requirements for a product granted a waiver. Requires the Commissioner of Food and Drugs (FDA) to review substances in order determine whether there is a reasonable certainty that no harm will result from aggregate exposure to such substance, taking into consideration potential adverse effects from low dose exposure and the effects on vulnerable populations and populations with high exposure. Sets forth remedial actions based on the Secretary's determination. Amends the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to require a manufacturer or supplier of a food contact substance to notify the Secretary of the identity and intended use of any such substance prior to its introduction into interstate commerce and of its determination that: (1) no adverse health effects result from low-dose exposures to such substance; and (2) such substance has not been shown, after tests which are appropriate for the evaluation of the safety of food contact substances, to cause reproductive or developmental toxicity in humans or animals.
Title
Ban Poisonous Additives Act of 2013
Sponsors
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Lois Capps [D-CA] | Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] |
Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] | Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Sam Farr [D-CA] |
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] |
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Michael Michaud [D-ME] | Rep. James Moran [D-VA] |
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] |
Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] | Rep. Niki Tsongas [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-06-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5033 (Related) 2014-07-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB2572 (Related) 2014-07-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2572 (Related) 2014-07-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Child health
Department of Health and Human Services
Food and Drug Administration (FDA)
Food industry and services
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health
Product safety and quality
Sex and reproductive health
Water quality
Women's health
Child health
Department of Health and Human Services
Food and Drug Administration (FDA)
Food industry and services
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health
Product safety and quality
Sex and reproductive health
Water quality
Women's health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2248/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2248/BILLS-113hr2248ih.pdf |