US HB2095 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 274.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 274.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Land Disposal Transparency and Efficiency Act - Bars any land or interests in land from being added to the inventory of lands and interests in land administered by the Bureau of Land Management (BLM) until a centralized database of all lands identified as suitable for disposal under BLM jurisdiction is easily accessible to the public on a BLM website. Requires the database to be updated to reflect changes in the status of lands identified for disposal under BLM administrative jurisdiction.
Title
Land Disposal Transparency and Efficiency Act
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-28 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 274. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-368. |
2014-01-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 17. |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-01-28 | House | Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged. |
2013-07-19 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-06-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2013-05-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2954 (Related) 2014-02-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.