US HB2005 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Personalized Handgun Safety Act - Requires the Director of the National Institute of Justice to make grants to qualified entities (states or local governments, organizations, or institutions of higher education) to develop technology for personalized handguns (a handgun that enables only the authorized user to fire it). Requires a recipient to use not less than 70% of grant funds to develop technology for personalized handguns. Allows such entity to use not more than: (1) 20% of such funds to develop technology for retrofitted personalized handguns, and (2) 10% of such funds for administrative costs. Provides for one-year grant awards, subject to renewal. Directs the Consumer Product Safety Commission (CPSC) to promulgate a consumer product safety standard providing a specified timetable by which handguns manufactured, sold, offered for sale, traded, transferred, shipped, leased, or distributed in the United States must be personalized handguns or retrofitted personalized handguns, depending on the date of manufacture. Exempts antique firearms and firearms owned by the Department of Defense (DOD). Requires the cost of retrofitting a handgun to be borne by the manufacturer if the manufacturer is operational at the time the retrofit is required. Makes appropriations for the Department of Justice (DOJ) available to the Attorney General for payments to reimburse handgun manufacturers for the costs of retrofitting handguns. Authorizes an official or agency of a state to bring a civil action in U.S. district court against a handgun seller or manufacturer on behalf of residents adversely affected by a violation of such standard. Amends the Protection of Lawful Commerce in Arms Act to exclude from the definition of "qualified product" any handgun manufactured after two years after enactment of this Act that is not a personalized handgun or retrofitted personalized handgun.
Title
Personalized Handgun Safety Act
Sponsors
Rep. John Tierney [D-MA] | Rep. Michael Capuano [D-MA] | Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA] | Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] |
Rep. Sam Farr [D-CA] | Rep. Janice Hahn [D-CA] | Rep. Rush Holt [D-NJ] | Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] |
Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] |
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. James Moran [D-VA] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] |
Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] | Rep. Niki Tsongas [D-MA] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2013-05-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade. |
2013-05-15 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2013-05-15 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-05-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2567 (Related) 2013-07-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
SB2068 (Related) 2014-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB2068 (Related) 2014-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Consumer Product Safety Commission
Crime and law enforcement
Firearms and explosives
Product safety and quality
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Consumer Product Safety Commission
Crime and law enforcement
Firearms and explosives
Product safety and quality
Research administration and funding
Research and development
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2005/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2005/BILLS-113hr2005ih.pdf |