US HB1797 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-5)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 370.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 370.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Consumer Product Safety Commission to promulgate a consumer product safety standard with respect to rechargeable lithium-ion batteries used in micromobility devices, and for other purposes.
Title
Setting Consumer Standards for Lithium-Ion Batteries Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ritchie Torres [D-NY] | Rep. Andrew Garbarino [R-NY] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Pat Ryan [D-NY] |
Rep. Jamaal Bowman [D-NY] | Rep. Anthony D'Esposito [R-NY] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Daniel Goldman [D-NY] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Jasmine Crockett [D-TX] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Kevin Mullin [D-CA] |
Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY] | Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
Rep. Nicholas Langworthy [R-NY] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Troy Carter [D-LA] |
Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Nicole Malliotakis [R-NY] | Rep. Marcus Molinaro [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 370. |
2024-04-05 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-446. |
2023-12-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 42 - 0. |
2023-12-05 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-11-02 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 20 - 0. |
2023-11-02 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-03-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Innovation, Data, and Commerce. |
2023-03-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-03-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1008 (Same As) 2023-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.