US HB1785 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 523.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 523.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mountains to Sound Greenway National Heritage Area Act - Establishes the Mountains to Sound Greenway National Heritage Area in the state of Washington. Designates the Mountains to Sound Greenway Trust as the local coordinating entity for the Heritage Area. Requires the Mountains to Sound Greenway Trust to prepare and submit a management plan for the Heritage Area.
Title
Mountains to Sound Greenway National Heritage Area Act
Sponsors
Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-22 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 523. |
2014-12-22 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-692. |
2014-11-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2014-11-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-11-19 | House | Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged. |
2014-07-29 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-05-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2013-04-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2602 (Related) 2014-12-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 640.
Subjects
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land use and conservation
Public lands and natural resources
Washington State
Watersheds
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Land use and conservation
Public lands and natural resources
Washington State
Watersheds
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats