US HB1513 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-14 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-14 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the inclusion of the land and interests commonly known as Gettysburg Train Station and its immediate surroundings in the Borough of Gettysburg, Pennsylvania, and the land and interests located along Plum Run in Cumberland Township, Pennsylvania, in Gettysburg National Military Park if the owner of the property has provided written consent for its inclusion. Declares that nothing in this Act shall be construed to create buffer zones outside of such property. States that the fact that an activity or use can be seen or heard from within such property shall not preclude that activity or use outside of the property. Permits the acquisition of property within the areas of the Train Station and along Plum Run by donation only.
Title
To revise the boundaries of the Gettysburg National Military Park to include the Gettysburg Train Station and certain land along Plum Run in Cumberland Township, to limit the means by which property within such revised boundaries may be acquired, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] | Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] | Rep. Charles Dent [R-PA] | Rep. Jim Gerlach [R-PA] |
Rep. Tom Marino [R-PA] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 396 N: 0 NV: 36 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2014-01-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 396 - 0 (Roll no. 12). (text: CR H167) |
2014-01-13 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H172) |
2014-01-13 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2014-01-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1513. |
2014-01-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H167-168) |
2014-01-13 | House | Mr. Hastings (WA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. (consideration: CR H167) |
2013-09-20 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 162. |
2013-09-20 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-222. |
2013-07-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2013-07-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-07-24 | House | Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged. |
2013-06-06 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-04-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2013-04-12 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1979) |
2013-04-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB782 (Related) 2014-05-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 394.
Subjects
Conflicts and wars
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Military history
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Pennsylvania
Property rights
Public lands and natural resources
Railroads
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Military history
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Pennsylvania
Property rights
Public lands and natural resources
Railroads