US HB1458 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1 Walter Hammond Place in Waldwick, New Jersey, as the "Staff Sergeant Joseph D'Augustine Post Office Building."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1 Walter Hammond Place in Waldwick, New Jersey, as the "Staff Sergeant Joseph D'Augustine Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Garrett [R-NJ] | Rep. Robert Andrews [D-NJ] | Rep. Rodney Frelinghuysen [R-NJ] | Rep. Rush Holt [D-NJ] |
Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] | Rep. Frank LoBiondo [R-NJ] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] |
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Jon Runyan [R-NJ] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2014-06-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-06-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5378) |
2014-06-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1458. |
2014-06-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5378-5379) |
2014-06-17 | House | Mr. Meadows moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2014-03-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-03-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-04-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
New Jersey
Postal service
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
New Jersey
Postal service