US HB1437 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 37-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-27 - Subcommittee Hearings Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-27 - Subcommittee Hearings Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize livestock producers and their employees to take black vultures in order to prevent death, injury, or destruction to livestock, and for other purposes.
Title
Black Vulture Relief Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. John Rose [R-TN] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. August Pfluger [R-TX] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] |
Rep. James Comer [R-KY] | Rep. Josh Brecheen [R-OK] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR] |
Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR] | Rep. Max Miller [R-OH] | Rep. Kevin Hern [R-OK] | Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] |
Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO] | Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] | Rep. Stephanie Bice [R-OK] | Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] |
Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Nancy Mace [R-SC] | Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA] |
Rep. Andrew Ogles [R-TN] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] |
Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Diana Harshbarger [R-TN] | Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA] |
Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA] | Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN] | Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] | Rep. Gregory Pence [R-IN] |
Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX] | Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] | Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] | Rep. Harriet Hageman [R-WY] |
Rep. Mark Alford [R-MO] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-27 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2023-04-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries. |
2023-03-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-03-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3358 (Related) 2023-11-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/1437/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr1437/BILLS-118hr1437ih.pdf |