US HB1391 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on December 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 113-207.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on December 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 113-207.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 25 South Oak Street in London, Ohio, as the "London Fallen Veterans Memorial Post Office."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 25 South Oak Street in London, Ohio, as the "London Fallen Veterans Memorial Post Office".
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH] |
Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Jim Jordan [R-OH] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] |
Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. James Renacci [R-OH] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] |
Rep. Patrick Tiberi [R-OH] | Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-16 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-207. |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2014-12-08 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2014-12-04 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6305-6306) |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 587. |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Carper without amendment. Without written report. |
2014-11-12 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2014-06-17 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2014-06-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-06-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5373) |
2014-06-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1391. |
2014-06-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5373-5374) |
2014-06-17 | House | Mr. Meadows moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2014-03-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-03-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-03-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2914 (Related) 2014-11-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
Ohio
Postal service
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
Ohio
Postal service
Veterans' organizations and recognition