US HB1308 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 246.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 246.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Endangered Salmon and Fisheries Predation Prevention Act - Amends the Marine Mammal Protection Act of 1972 to authorize the Secretary of the department in which the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (NOAA) is operating to issue one-year permits to Washington, Oregon, Idaho, the Nez Perce Tribe, the Confederated Tribes of the Umatilla Indian Reservation, the Confederated Tribes of the Warm Springs Reservation of Oregon, the Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation, and the Columbia River Inter-Tribal Fish Commission for the lethal taking on the waters of the Columbia River or its tributaries of sea lions that are part of a healthy population that is not listed as an endangered species or threatened species under the Endangered Species Act of 1973 in order to protect endangered and threatened species of salmon and other nonlisted fish species. Authorizes the Secretary to renew such permits. Prohibits such a permit from authorizing the lethal taking of more than 10 sea lions. Limits the cumulative annual taking of sea lions each year under all such permits to 1% of the annual potential biological removal level. Authorizes the Secretary to suspend the issuance of such permits if, after five years, lethal removal authority is no longer necessary to protect salmonid and other fish species from sea lion predation. Expresses the sense of Congress that: (1) preventing predation by sea lions, recovery of listed salmonid stocks, and preventing future listings of fish stocks in the Columbia River is a vital priority; (2) permit holders exercising lethal removal authority should be trained in wildlife management; and (3) the government should continue to fund lethal and nonlethal removal measures for preventing such predation.
Title
Endangered Salmon and Fisheries Predation Prevention Act
Sponsors
Rep. Doc Hastings [R-WA] | Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] | Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] | Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID] |
Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-23 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 246. |
2014-01-23 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-330. |
2013-11-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 16. |
2013-11-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-11-14 | House | Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Discharged. |
2013-06-13 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-04-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs. |
2013-03-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Subjects
Animals
Endangered and threatened species
Fishes
Lakes and rivers
Licensing and registrations
Mammals
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Oregon
Pacific Ocean
Washington State
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Endangered and threatened species
Fishes
Lakes and rivers
Licensing and registrations
Mammals
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Oregon
Pacific Ocean
Washington State
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection