US HB1036 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-09 - Became Public Law No: 113-110.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-09 - Became Public Law No: 113-110.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 103 Center Street West in Eatonville, Washington, as the "National Park Ranger Margaret Anderson Post Office."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 103 Center Street West in Eatonville, Washington, as the "National Park Ranger Margaret Anderson Post Office".
Sponsors
Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Doc Hastings [R-WA] | Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] |
Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA] |
Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-09 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-110. |
2014-06-09 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3243) |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 385. |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Carper without amendment. Without written report. |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2014-03-24 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2574) |
2014-03-24 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1036. |
2014-03-24 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2574-2575) |
2014-03-24 | House | Mr. Farenthold moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2014-03-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-03-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2748 (Related) 2015-01-02 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 564.
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Postal service
Washington State
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Postal service
Washington State