US HB1005 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 57-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defund Obamacare Act - Deauthorizes appropriations to carry out the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act or the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010, or any amendments made by them. Rescinds the unobligated balance of funds made available under such Acts.
Title
Defund Obamacare Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions. |
2013-04-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training. |
2013-03-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-03-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2013-03-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to House House Administration |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and the Workforce, the Judiciary, Natural Resources, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB603 (Related) 2013-03-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Appropriations
Comprehensive health care
Department of Health and Human Services
Executive agency funding and structure
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Comprehensive health care
Department of Health and Human Services
Executive agency funding and structure
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/1005/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr1005/BILLS-113hr1005ih.pdf |